Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUnited Network for Organ Sharing v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityRichmond
Case Number3:2018cv00158
Date Filed2018-03-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Robert E. Payne
PlaintiffUnited Network for Organ Sharing
Case DescriptionThe United Network for Organ Sharing submitted a FOIA request to the Health Resources and Services Administration at the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning responses provided to a request for proposal pertaining to the Organ Procurement and Transplantation Network. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It located 50 pages, which it withheld under Exemption 4 (confidential business information) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). UNOS filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, UNOS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-081COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-598153) filed by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-082Proposed Summons re 1 Complaint, by United Network for Organ Sharing. (Attachments: # 1 US Attorney, # 2 US Attorney - EDVA)(Lucier, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-093Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, ) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-144NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Margaret Harker on behalf of U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (Harker, Laura) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-045Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Brief in Support Thereof by U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Harker, Laura) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-096ORDER that DEFENDANT'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT THEREOF (ECF No. 5 ) is granted. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by April 26, 2018 (please see ORDER for more information.) Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 04/09/2018. (smej, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff