Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00551
Date Filed2018-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted four FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a range of topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-091COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5366697) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Bureau of Land Management, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-092Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsth) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-284ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2018. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) Modified on 3/29/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/19/18. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/29/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 3/19/2018 (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/29/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2018. (Ruscavage-Barz, Samantha) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/29/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney was entered in error (incorrect document attached) and was refiled as Docket Entry 7 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney. (znmw) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-138NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-139NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Nokes on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Nokes, Kelly) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/16/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1310ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-16VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 5/9/18. . . . .NOTICE OF HEARING: The parties shall take notice that an Initial Scheduling Conference is scheduled for 5/14/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) Modified on 5/10/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-2011STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/20/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-0912Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for May 14, 2018 is VACATED and the parties are directed to file a further Joint Status Report by June 29, 2018, including a proposed schedule for rolling productions and any further proceedings the parties may think necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/9/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are ordered to file a further Joint Status Report by July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/2/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 7/13/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-1314Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are ordered to file a further Joint Status Report by August 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/13/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 8/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-2715Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are ordered to file a further Joint Status Report by September 27, 2018, including a proposed schedule for any further proceedings they think necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/27/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 9/27/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-1816NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly E. Nokes (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2717Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are ordered to file a further Joint Status Report by October 31, 2018, including a proposed schedule for any further proceedings they think necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/27/18. (lctnm1) Modified on 9/27/2018 (hmc). (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-3118Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference hearing on December 7, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/1/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-02Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar