Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00552
Date Filed2018-03-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the agency's reversal of its ban on importation of African elephant trophies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-091COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5367126) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO, PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Case related to Case No. 1:17-cv-02504-RCL. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-093LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-09Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-03-094SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
2018-04-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/22/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 3/26/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2018.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff