Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Transportation Security Administration (TSA)
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv01539
Date Filed2018-03-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Northern California submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration's headquarters in Arlington VA for records concerning the agency's searches of electronic devices. The agency did not acknowledge receipt of the request. The ACLU of Northern California also sent a FOIA request to the San Francisco Office of TSA for records concerning the agency's searches of electronic devices. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. But after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either request, the ACLU of Northern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantTransportation Security Administration (TSA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-121COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12178000.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-122Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-123Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/12/2018) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-124Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-135Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2018 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/13/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-136Summons Issued as to Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-157SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Transportation Security Administration (TSA) served on 3/15/2018, answer due 4/5/2018. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 3/15/2018) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-218NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Lye (Lye, Linda) (Filed on 3/21/2018) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-279CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2018 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-0210CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California.. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/2/2018) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-0411STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0412CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/18/2018 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0413CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Transportation Security Administration (TSA).. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-0414ORDER granting 11 Stipulation to Continue Date to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Case Management Conference. Defendant will have until 5/30/2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference is reset from 6/14/2018 to 6/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/04/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-05-2115CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Based on the court's scheduling conflict, the court continues the initial CMC from 6/28/2018 to 8/9/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor and directs the filing of the initial CMC statement by 8/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2916STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Transportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-2917Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 16 Stipulation to Continue Date to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Continue Case Management Conference. Defendant will have until 6/13/2018 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-1318Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byTransportation Security Administration (TSA). (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 6/13/2018) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-0919NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1020ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, July 30, 2018, at 11:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-2421ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/24/2018) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-0122ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/30/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0123JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 8/1/2018) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0924Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Total Time in Court: 4 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorney: Linda Lye. Defendant's Attorney: Julie Davis. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2018) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar