Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleReproductive Rights and Justice Project v. HHS
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2018cv00440
Date Filed2018-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Alfred V. Covello
PlaintiffReproductive Rights and Justice Project
Case DescriptionThe Reproductive Rights & Justice Project at Yale Law School submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning emails from a list of domain names and from a list of conservative organizations, and any emails from outside organizations mentioning Planned Parenthood. The RRJP also requested inclusion in the educational fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told RRJP that it was being referred to the HHS Program Support Center for response. After hearing nothing further from the agency. RRJP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDept. of HHS U.S.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-141COMPLAINT against Dept. of HHS ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4755149.), filed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Narrowed Request, # 4 Exhibit Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit Further Correspondence)(Kenney, Cortelyou) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-142AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dept. of HHS, filed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Acknowledgment, # 3 Exhibit Narrowed Request, # 4 Exhibit Correspondence, # 5 Exhibit Further Correspondence, # 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kenney, Cortelyou) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dept. of HHS. (Kenney, Cortelyou) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-143Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-14Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-144ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/14/2018.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-165NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project, 1 Complaint, filed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project, Request to Issue Summons, 2 Amended Complaint, filed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project, and 4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2018.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-166ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept. of HHS* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Cortelyou C. Kenney* *Yale Law School* *127 Wall St.* *New Haven, CT 06520*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-297SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Kenney, Cortelyou) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-308MOTION for Attorney(s) Priscilla J. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-4775847) by Reproductive Rights and Justice Project. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Kenney, Cortelyou) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-029ORDER granting 8 motion to appear pro hac vice. Certificate of good standing due on or before 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on April 2, 2018. (Kontyko, K.) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff