Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBORN FREE USA v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00567
Date Filed2018-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBORN FREE USA
Case DescriptionBorn Free USA submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the agency's establishment of the International Wildlife Conservation Council. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after receiving nothing more substantive from the agency, Born Free USA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-141COMPLAINT against U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5372662) filed by BORN FREE USA: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-142SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-08-24ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The Complaint in this action was filed on March 14, 2018. Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that the Court dismiss the action without prejudice if "a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed." Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Accordingly, the plaintiff shall file, by September 7, 2018, either (1) proof of service on the defendant; (2) a motion for extension of time to serve the defendant; or (3) a statement setting forth good cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 24, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar