Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHAERR v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00575
Date Filed2018-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffGENE C. SCHAERR
Case DescriptionGene Schaerr, an attorney representing an anonymous client involved in the Trump campaign and transition, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and other agencies who were part of the intelligence community for records concerning unmasking and upstreaming. The requests also asked for records concerning a number of individuals with the Trump campaign or subsequent administration. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further any of the agencies, Schaerr filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
The Executive Office
Office of the Legal Adviser, Suite 5,600
600 19th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20522
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Opinion/Order [39]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5373922) filed by GENE C. SCHAERR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Civil Cover Sheet, # 23 Summons US Attorney, # 24 Summons US Department of Justice, # 25 Summons US Attorney General, # 26 Summons Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 27 Summons State Department, # 28 Summons CIA, # 29 Summons NSA)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-162CIVIL COVER SHEET (MODIFIED) by GENE C. SCHAERR filed by GENE C. SCHAERR.(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-19Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-193SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-054NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-205NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. Attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell terminated. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-236MOTION for Extension of Time to respond re 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (jf) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-247NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Hunt on behalf of All Defendants (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file a responsive pleading by May 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/24/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-078ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-089ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before June 5, 2018. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/8/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-0510STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by July 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/8/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-07-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER. Defendants Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency, and Department of State must file a status report on the production of documents by September 5, 2018. With respect to defendant National Security Agency, the Court acknowledges the complexity of the review required but it is not persuaded that the six month time period is reasonable given the relatively small number of records involved. Therefore, defendant NSA must endeavor to do as much as possible by September 5, 2018 and provide the Court with an adjusted proposed date of completion in the status report to be filed on that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/16/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-08-1812MOTION for Hearing in-person status conference by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) Modified event title on 8/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 08/18/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER. The 12 Motion for In-Person Status Conference is DENIED without prejudice. Any legal questions related to a Glomar response will not be resolved based on oral representations made at a status conference. If it turns out that the agency intends to rely on such a response, these questions will be presented for resolution with supporting affidavits and briefing in the form of a motion for summary judgment or partial summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/20/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-0513STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must file a status report by November 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/6/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-11-1914STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must submit a status report to the Court by December 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/20/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-1915STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the status report 15 , it is ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment must be filed by March 15, 2019; plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment must be filed by April 5, 2019; defendants' reply and opposition must be filed by April 26, 2019; and plaintiff's reply must be filed by May 10, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will schedule any hearing on a date that is convenient for the parties and the Court if and when it determines a hearing is necessary. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/20/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-02-1416Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-19MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Defendants' motion for summary judgment must be filed by April 30, 2019. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment must be filed by May 21, 2019. Defendants' reply and cross-opposition must be filed by June 11, 2019. Plaintiff's cross-reply must be filed by June 25, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/19/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-04-3017Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-01MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due on May 14, 2019; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on June 4, 2019; defendants' reply and cross-opposition is due on June 25, 2019; and plaintiff's reply is due on July 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/1/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-1418MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Undisputed Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Antoinette Shiner, # 4 Exhibit to Shiner Declaration (A-I), # 5 Declaration of David Hardy, # 6 Exhibit to Hardy Declaration (A-P), # 7 Declaration of Steven Thompson, # 8 Exhibit to Thompson Declaration (A-M), # 9 Declaration of Patrick Findlay, # 10 Exhibit to Findlay Declaration (A-C), # 11 Declaration of Patricia Gaviria, # 12 Exhibit to Gaviria Declaration (A-D), # 13 Declaration of Eric Stein, # 14 Exhibit to Stein Declaration (1-3))(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-2019Joint MOTION to Seal Document File ECF No. 18 Under Seal, Nunc Pro Tunc re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) Modified event title on 5/20/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file under seal defendant's motion for summary judgment 18 and all associated attachments. Defendants must file a redacted version of the motion and attachments on the public docket by May 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/21/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2920MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Antoinette Shiner, # 2 Exhibit to Shiner Declaration (A-I) (REDACTED), # 3 Declaration of David Hardy (REDACTED), # 4 Exhibit to Hardy Declaration (A-I) (REDACTED), # 5 Exhibit to Hardy Declaration (J-P) (REDACTED), # 6 Declaration of Steven Thompson, # 7 Exhibit to Thompson Declaration (A-M) (REDACTED), # 8 Declaration of Patrick Findlay, # 9 Exhibit to Findlay Declaration (A-C), # 10 Declaration of Patricia Gaviria, # 11 Exhibit to Gaviria Declaration (A-D), # 12 Declaration of Eric Stein, # 13 Exhibit to Stein Declaration (1-3), # 14 Text of Proposed Order, # 15 Statement of Facts)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-3121MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-04MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by June 25, 2019; defendants must file their reply and cross-opposition by July 26, 2019; and plaintiff must file his reply by August 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/25/2019; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/26/2019; Reply to Opposition to Cross-Motion due by 8/9/2019. (tg) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-2122Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file cross-motion for summary judgment , Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by July 5, 2019; defendants must file their reply and cross-opposition by August 16, 2019; and plaintiff must file his reply by August 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/24/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-0223Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment , Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by July 12, 2019; defendants must file their reply and cross-opposition by August 23, 2019; and plaintiff must file his cross-reply by September 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/05/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 7/12/2019; defendants' opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 8/23/2019; plaintiff's reply to opposition to cross motion due by 9/6/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-1224RESPONSE re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENE C. SCHAERR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Responsive Documents Identified by Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Hunt (Dec. 17, 2018), # 3 Exhibit ODNI Letter to Sen. Burr and Sen. Warner (Jun. 20, 2017), # 4 Exhibit ODNI Letter to Unnamed Senator, # 5 Exhibit Identities in SIGINT Manual, # 6 Exhibit Annex A: Dissemination of Congressional Identity Information, # 7 Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1225Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Responsive Documents Identified by Plaintiff, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter to Hunt (Dec. 17, 2018), # 3 Exhibit C - ODNI Letter to Sen. Burr and Sen. Warner (Jun. 20, 2017), # 4 Exhibit D - ODNI Letter to Unnamed Senator, # 5 Exhibit E - Identities in SIGINT Manual, # 6 Exhibit F - Annex A: Dissemination of Congressional Identity Information, # 7 Statement of Facts, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-08-2326RESPONSE re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (and Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Linda M. Kiyosaki, # 4 Declaration of David M. Hardy (Second), # 5 Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan, # 6 Exhibit to Tiernan Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Susan C. Weetman)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-2627REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Linda M. Kiyosaki, # 4 Declaration of David M. Hardy (Second), # 5 Declaration of Kevin G. Tiernan, # 6 Exhibit to Tiernan Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Susan C. Weetman)(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-2628NOTICE of Filing of Defendants' Amended Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 26 Response to motion,, (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-08-2629NOTICE of Filing of Defendants' Amended Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 27 Reply to opposition to Motion,, (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-09-0330First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment 25 by September 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/04/2019)
2019-09-1831REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GENE C. SCHAERR. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Statement of Facts)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-10-2532MOTION to Substitute Party by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-11-0833Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-11-1334MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Substitute Party by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 11/13/2019)
2019-11-14MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his reply in support of his motion to substitute party 32 by November 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-2235REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by GENE C. SCHAERR. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gene C. Schaerr)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2020-01-1436MOTION for Hearing re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party , 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 27 Reply to opposition to Motion,, 35 Reply to opposition to Motion, 31 Reply to opposition to Motion, 24 Response to motion,, 25 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 33 Memorandum in Opposition, 26 Response to motion,, by GENE C. SCHAERR (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-16MINUTE ORDER denying 36 Motion for Hearing. The Court is aware of the pendency of the motions in this case, and they are under advisement. The Court will schedule a hearing if and when it deems it necessary to do so. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/16/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-2837ORDER. Upon consideration of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c), the parties' pleadings, and the applicable points and authorities, the motion to substitute 32 will be DENIED. See Order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/28/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-2838ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 56 and 58, and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 20 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 25 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by March 27, 2020 to update the Court on whether further proceedings are necessary in this matter. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/28/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-01-2839MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/28/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar