Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLos Alamos Study Group v. National Nuclear Security Administration
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2018cv00248
Date Filed2018-03-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough
PlaintiffLos Alamos Study Group a non-profit New Mexico organization
Case DescriptionThe Los Alamos Study Group submitted a FOIA request to the National Nuclear Security Administration for records about the agency's analysis of alternatives for plutonium pit production. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Los Alamos Study Group that its request was being processed. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Los Alamos Study Group filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Nuclear Security Administration
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-141COMPLAINT against National Nuclear Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Los Alamos Study Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farris, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5697907 re 1 Complaint, filed by Los Alamos Study Group (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Farris, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-14Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (kdh) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-142PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kdh) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-03-15Summons Issued as to National Nuclear Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kdh) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-203SUMMONS Returned Executed by Los Alamos Study Group. National Nuclear Security Administration served on 3/16/2018, answer due 5/15/2018. (Farris, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-224Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or otherwise plead by United States of America. (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-235ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer or responsive pleadings due by 5/15/2018. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mlt) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-236NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of United States of America (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-277SUMMONS Returned Executed by Los Alamos Study Group. United States of America served on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. (Farris, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-278SUMMONS Returned Executed by Los Alamos Study Group. National Nuclear Security Administration served on 3/23/2018, answer due 5/22/2018. (Farris, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff