Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOS PADRES FORESTWATCH v. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00579
Date Filed2018-03-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffLOS PADRES FORESTWATCH
Case DescriptionLos Padres Forestwatch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Secretary's recommendations regarding changes to national monuments, including the Carrizo Plain National Monument. Los Padres Forestwatch also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Los Padres Forestwatch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-151COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5374593) filed by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney Civil Process Clerk, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for Defendant Office of the Secretary, U.S. Department of the Interior)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-152Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-154MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rene Voss, :Firm- Natural Resources Law, :Address- 15 Alderney Rd., San Anselmo, CA 94960. Phone No. - (415) 446-9027. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5375720. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rene Voss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Rene Peter Voss, of Natural Resources Law, located at 15 Alderney Rd., San Anselmo, CA 94960, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/23/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/18. (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/23/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 3/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/23/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-04-208NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-239First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2310RESPONSE re 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 9 Defendant's First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and the plaintiff's response thereto, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before May 8, 2018. The Court cautions that no further extensions will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 24, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/8/2018, (hs) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-0811ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-1512NOTICE of Four Related Cases by OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ECF No. 23 in SUWA v. DOI, Civ. A. No. 17-2314 (EGS))(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-07-1713STATUS REPORT by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6-22-18 Order in 1:17-cv-02314-EGS, # 2 Exhibit 3-20-18 Order in 1:17-cv-02314-EGS, # 3 Exhibit 7-2-18 Order in 1:17-cv-02314-EGS)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 13 Plaintiff's Scheduling Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before August 3, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court indicating the parties' positions as to how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 19, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-0314Joint STATUS REPORT by LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Scheduling Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall continue its monthly records production process in response to the plaintiff's and others' National Monument FOIA requests, specifically identifying those documents which are particular to the Carrizo Plain National Monument in California. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall issue a final determination letter and Vaughn index within thirty days of when its response to the plaintiff's FOIA request is complete. It is further ORDERED that on or before October 5, 2018, the parties shall file another joint status report describing the status of the defendant's records production and how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 6, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar