Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00592
Date Filed2018-03-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications from the White House that reference Sahar Nowrouzzadeh and other State Department employees subject to reassignment or termination. Protect Democracy Project also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Protect Democracy Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C ST., NW
Washington, DC 20301
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5377623) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons to Department of State, # 4 Summons to Attorney General, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsth) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-04-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/5/2018. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/03/2018. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/3/2018 (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-247NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-048Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-07MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's complaint by June 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/7/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-06-069NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-0610ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/6/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the 11 Joint Status Report filed by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by July 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/2/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2018. (kh) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-3112Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the 12 Joint Status Report filed by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by September 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/1/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-09-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the 13 Joint Status Report filed by the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/17/2018. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/12/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-11-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar