Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSHAW v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00593
Date Filed2018-03-16
Date Closed2019-11-19
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffSUMMER SHAW
Case DescriptionSummer Shaw submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning emails sent to or from Lanny Breuer's email account pertaining to certain topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told Shaw that the requests had been placed on its complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Shaw filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Opinion/Order [38]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-161COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5377802) filed by Summer Shaw. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-162NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Case related to Case No. 17-2756. (zsb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-19Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-193SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-194REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE as to DOJ re 1 Complaint, filed by SUMMER SHAW. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SUMMER SHAW.(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
2018-03-195SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (zsb) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/19/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/18/2018. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-207RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/19/2018. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-208RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/20/2018 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-22MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's status hearing in the companion case of No. 17-2756, the Court ORDERS that the Government shall file its Answer by April 6, 2018, and both parties shall submit a joint status report by April 20, 2018, proposing schedules for the processing and production of the requested documents. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/22/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/6/2018. Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-279NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-0510ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) Modified to add link on 4/6/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-2012Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Position Papers by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Joint 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit their separate proposed schedules on or before April 27, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/23/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-23Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit their separate proposed schedules by 4/27/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2713Joint STATUS REPORT (Defendant's Statement) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2714STATUS REPORT (Plaintiff's Position Regarding Schedule) by SUMMER SHAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing set for May 21, 2018, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/1/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 5/21/2018. A Joint Status Report is due by 7/27/2018. A further Status Conference set for 7/31/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (nbn) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties shall submit a joint status report by July 27, 2018; and 2) They shall return for a further status hearing on July 31, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/21/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-07-2715Joint STATUS REPORT with Separate Position Papers to Follow by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-2716STATUS REPORT (Position Paper with Respect to ECF No. 15) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-2717STATUS REPORT (Position Brief Regarding ECF 15) by SUMMER SHAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall process no fewer than 200 pages per month for each of the two requests; 2) It shall make monthly productions on or about the 15th of each month starting in September 2018; 3) The parties shall file a further joint status report by January 18, 2019; and 4) They shall appear for a further status hearing on January 22, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/31/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 7/31/2018. Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. Status Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (znbn) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-10-0118ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SUMMER SHAW. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02281. (Himes, Lisa); Modified on 10/5/2018 (tth). (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0119NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SUMMER SHAW. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02281. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 18 Notice of Related Case was entered in error. The pleading was refiled as docket entry 19 . (tth) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2019-01-1720Consent MOTION to Stay and continue by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris). Added MOTION to Continue on 1/24/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 20 Motion for Stay is GRANTED, the status hearing set for January 22, 2019, is VACATED, and the parties shall submit a joint status report within 21 days after appropriations are restored. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/17/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-1521MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 21 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED and that the parties shall file a joint status report by February 20, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/19/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-2022Joint STATUS REPORT by DOJ and by SUMMER SHAW. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-2123NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that a status hearing is set for March 13, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-1224NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 3/13/2019. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (znbn) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-13MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on the first request shall be due by May 30, 2019, with Defendant's opposition/cross-motion due by July 1, 2019, Plaintiff's opposition/reply due by July 22, 2019, and Defendant's reply due by August 5, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/13/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-05-3025MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by SUMMER SHAW (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-2626MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Christina Butler)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-26MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 26 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file such opposition by June 28, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/26/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2627RESPONSE re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SUMMER SHAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition due by 6/28/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file any Reply to Plaintiff's 27 Response by June 28, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/27/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/28/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-2828REPLY to opposition to motion re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court, consistent with its usual practice, expects counsel to consult with each other regarding motions for extensions of time and believes that this could have been accomplished more cooperatively here. That issue notwithstanding, the Court ORDERS that Defendant's 26 Motion for Extension is GRANTED, but Plaintiff may propose a date by which her responsive pleading is due so that counsel may avoid a vacation conflict. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/1/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0329NOTICE Regarding Scheduling by SUMMER SHAW (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Plaintiff's 29 Notice and ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its opposition and cross-motion by July 15, 2019; (2) Plaintiff shall file her opposition and reply by August 14, 2019; and (3) Defendant shall file its reply by August 28, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/3/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/15/2019. Reply to Motion Cross Motions due by 7/15/2019. for Summary Judgment due by 8/14/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 8/14/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 8/28/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-1530MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Christina Butler, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1531Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration of Christina Butler, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-08-1432Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SUMMER SHAW. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1433REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SUMMER SHAW. (ztd); (See docket entry no. 32 to view.) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-2834Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 34 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its reply brief by September 6, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/29/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply Brief due by 9/6/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-0335ERRATA Notice of Errata (Date Correction) by SUMMER SHAW re 33 Reply to opposition to Motion, 32 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Himes, Lisa) Modified event title on 9/4/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-0636REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-11-1937ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; 2) Defendant's 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; and 3) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of Defendant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-1938MEMORANDUM OPINION re 37 Order on Motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar