Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00638
Date Filed2018-03-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the agency's success in thwarting attempts to evade workplace enforcement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantUS IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
500 12th Stree, SW
Washington DC, DC 20001
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-201COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5381834) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Defendant)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-20Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-294ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 03/29/2018. (DM) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") served on 3/30/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-05-028NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-029ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-1710ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than JUNE 18, 2018 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 17, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-3011NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Miano on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Miano, John) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/1/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0812NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-07-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant's searches are ongoing and that the parties are conferring regarding search parameters. The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by JULY 18, 2018 , identifying the status of their negotiation of search parameters and, if appropriate at that time, proposing a processing schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 9, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2018. (kt) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1814Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, which indicates that the parties have made progress in their continued negotiation of search parameters. In particular, the parties have agreed on parameters for one of the five categories of records sought by Plaintiff's FOIA request, and Defendant intends to propose a processing schedule for that category. The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by AUGUST 21, 2018 , identifying the status of their negotiation of search parameters and processing schedules. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 26, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-2115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, which indicates that the parties have made progress in their continued negotiation of search parameters for four of the five categories of records sought by Plaintiff's FOIA request. With regard to the fifth category, Defendant has completed its search for documents and intends to begin processing and soon producing those records. The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report by DECEMBER 4, 2018 , identifying the status of Defendant's searches and records processing and proposing a plan for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 29, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar