Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00645
Date Filed2018-03-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
PlaintiffNATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and the National Women's Law Center submitted FOIA requests to OMB for records concerning the agency's decision to evoke its approval of the revised EEO-1 form. The two organizations also requested fee waivers. OMB acknowledged receipt of their requests and indicated that some records had been compiled in response to their requests. However, after hearing nothing further about the requests, the Lawyers Committee and NWLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-211COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5382875) filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Martin, Emily) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-212MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Goldberger, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street, New York, NY 10019-6119. Phone No. - 212.415.9200. Fax No. - 212.953.7201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383077. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-213MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Colin Wicker, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - 612.492.6687. Fax No. - 612.340-2868 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383100. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-214MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Bolstad, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 54402. Phone No. - 612.492.6531. Fax No. - 612.340.2868 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Emily) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
2018-03-21Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-265SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-27MINUTE ORDER granting 2 , 3 , 4 motions for leave to appear pro hac vice. Daniel Goldberger, Colin Wicker, and Sam Bolstad are hereby admitted pro hac vice to this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 27, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-296STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/29/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-297NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Raghu on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER (Raghu, Maya) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-058NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW (Greenbaum, Jon) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-249NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-2511RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-2512RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/2/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bolstad, Sam) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-0213ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-03MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 28, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 3, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 5/28/2018. (mac) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-2914Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 14 the parties' joint request for an extension of time. The parties are directed to file their status report by no later than June 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 11, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/12/2018. (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1215Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER. (Bolstad, Sam) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1216NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding defendant's searches, including search terms, custodians, and the offices that will be searched, by no later than June 22, 2018. The parties are also directed to submit a status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 15, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/3/2018 (mac) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-0317Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER. In view of 17 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further status with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 6, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 8/22/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 07/07/2018)
2018-08-2218Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to submit a further status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/23/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Status Report due by 11/5/2018. (mac) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-11-0519Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER. In light of 19 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than December 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/5/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar