Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCervantes Anguiano v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv01782
Date Filed2018-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffAriel Cervantes Anguiano
Case DescriptionAriel Anguiano submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning his removal proceedings. The agency acknowledged his request, but U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services responded to his request instead by providing his alien file. USCIS also referred 87 pages to ICE for its direct response. ICE disclosed 45 pages. Anguiano then filed an administrative appeal. ICE remanded Anguiano's request for a further search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Anguiano filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-221COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12210666.). Filed byAriel Cervantes Anguiano. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farkas, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-222Proposed Summons. (Farkas, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-223Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/5/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-224Certificate of Interested Entities by Ariel Cervantes Anguiano (Leigh, Daniel) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-265Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-266Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-307CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ariel Cervantes Anguiano re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 4 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Farkas, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/30/2018) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-048CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ariel Cervantes Anguiano.. (Farkas, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/4/2018) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-139STIPULATION Re: Extension of time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 4/13/2018) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-1610CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/30/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-1611CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-2912United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-3113NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) Joint Notice (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-3114ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Farkas, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-0115ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 6/1/2018) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0416ADR Remark: The ADR Unit is in receipt of the Joint Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference filed on 5/31/2018 (ECF # 13 ) and will not schedule an ADR Phone Conference at this time. Any party may contact the ADR Unit to schedule an ADR Phone Conference, and counsel should do so promptly if the case is not resolved directly. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-1417CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Initial Case Management Statement filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 6/14/2018) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-2218Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/21/2018. Defendant to file Motion for Summary Judgment by August 9, 2018. (Not Reported)(Time: 5 mins) Attorney for Plaintiff: Benjamin Farkas; Daniel Leigh. Attorney for Defendant: Raven Norris. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-08-0319STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0620ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to File Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-2921STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Norris, Raven) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-3022ORDER as modified by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 21 Stipulation To Extend Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-0423MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 9/25/2018. Replies due by 10/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1-12)(Norris, Raven) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar