Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00651
Date Filed2018-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a SF-299 application submitted to Grand Teton National Park for permission to build cell towers in the park and the agency's announcement of a policy to grant permission for building cell towers in national parks. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PEER's request for a fee waiver. The agency told PEER that it had located documents but had not yet reviewed them. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-221COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5383518) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons AG, # 3 Summons DOI, # 4 Summons USAO)(Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-222LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/27/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2018. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-03-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 3/26/2018 (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-03-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/27/2018. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff