Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. USDA FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00653
Date Filed2018-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning Forest Service-owned land that had been closed to the public since 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUSDA FOREST SERVICE
DefendantUSDA FOREST SERVICE
201 14th Street, SW, DC 20024
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-221COMPLAINT against USDA FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5383901) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Defendant)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-222LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-22Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to USDA FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jd) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-04-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. USDA FOREST SERVICE served on 4/3/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-167NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of USDA FOREST SERVICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff