Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKertchen v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2018cv05231
Date Filed2018-03-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Benjamin H. Settle
PlaintiffVitaliy Kertchen
Case DescriptionVitaliy Kertchen, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records about the National Instant Criminal Background Check System's state terminology and restoration of rights pages. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Kertchen filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Kertchen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-221COMPLAINT against defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation (Receipt # 0981-5250034), filed by Vitaliy Kertchen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kertchen, Vitaliy) Modified on 3/23/2018: edited text language (CMG). (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-23Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23NOTICE TO FILER - ATTORNEY REMOVED FROM THE DOCKET: The Clerk's office noted that plaintiff and counsel are the same, and therefore has removed counsel from the record. All further filings will need to be in paper and mailed to the court. If plaintiff wishes to file electronically, he will need to register for electronic filing using the form provided on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov. If you have any questions or require further assistance, please feel free to contact the case administrator at 253-882-3802. Thank you. (CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiff w/form) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-232(3) Summonses Issued in paper as to defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation and mailed to plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 summons for FBI, # 2 summons for US Attorney General)(CMG) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff