Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00668
Date Filed2018-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning funding for the Open Society Foundation's operations in Colombia or other South American organizations that might receive funding through the Open Society Foundation for their work in Colombia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5386366) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
2018-03-23Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zmd) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/2/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/2/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/02/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/3/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-275NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-037SCHEDULING ORDER requiring the parties to submit joint or separate proposed schedules for filing dispositive motions by not later than June 1, 2018. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/3/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-06-018STATUS REPORT Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-049Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Joint Status Report)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that [9-2] defendant's status report is deemed FILED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/5/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 and [9-2] the parties' status reports, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than July 6, 2018 containing either a proposed document production schedule or a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/5/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (ztd) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-07-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-10-0912MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on defendant's document production by not later than November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/9/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-11-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on defendant's document production by not later than January 15, 2019. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/24/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/24/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2019-01-1114Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 defendant's unopposed motion for a stay and for extension of time in light of the lapse in appropriations, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that all pending deadlines in this action are stayed for the duration of the lapse; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file a joint status report both notifying the Court that funding has been restored and, in accordance with the Court's November 24, 2018, Minute Order, updating the Court on defendant's document production, by not later than seven days after the lapse has ceased. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/14/2019. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-02-0115NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 defendant's notice of restored funding and request to file a joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court on defendant's document production by not later than March 12, 2019. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/14/2019. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2019. (tb) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-1216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on defendant's document production by not later than May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/13/2019. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2019. (tb) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar