Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBERNICKER v. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2018cv01243
Date Filed2018-03-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE
PlaintiffBRENDAN BERNICKER
Case DescriptionBrendan Bernicker submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Agency for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and subsequently told Bernicker that it would take some time to respond. Bernicker then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-231COMPLAINT against NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 175698.), filed by BRENDAN BERNICKER. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-23Summons Issued as to NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY. Two Forwarded To: pro se plaintiff, one given to AUSA on 3/27/18 (jwl, ) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-032Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, ) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-063MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING filed by BRENDAN BERNICKER.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jaa, ) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-094ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/6/18.4/9/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH ECF APPLICATION, COPY PLACED IN U.S. ATTORNEY BIN.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-175CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRENDAN BERNICKER , AFFIDAVIT of Service by Daniel A. Zahn re: served Process upon Defendant National Security Agency by Certified Mail on 4/13/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Mailing Receipts and USPS Return Receipts)(BERNICKER, BRENDAN) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-016STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL JUNE 4, 2018 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 4/30/18. 5/1/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL AND COPY TO US ATTORNEY BIN.(jaa, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/3/2018) (jaa, ). (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-307NOTICE OF HEARING: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/2/2018 05:00 PM IN COURTROOM 3B BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: # 1 Electronic Discovery Order, # 2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan of Rule 26 f Meeting and)(amw, ) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-058STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT UNTIL SEPTEMBER 4, 2018 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/5/18. 6/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 6/27/2018 (jaa, ). *VACATED PER ORDER 6/27/18. (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-269NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 7/2/2018 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-2710STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 2, 2018 AT 10 AM IS CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT AND THE STIPULATION APPROVED AND ENTERED ON JUNE 5, 2018 IS VACATED OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/27/18. 6/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar