Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHuman Rights Watch v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv01842
Date Filed2018-03-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
Case DescriptionHuman Rights Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records from the Asylum Division at U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services referring to due process violations or other alleged misconduct by Customs and Border Patrol agents. Human Rights Watch also requested a fee waiver. The agency disclosed 229 pages, 175 of which were heavily redacted. Human Rights Watch filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Human Rights Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-261COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12218110.). Filed byHuman Rights Watch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-262Proposed Summons. (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-263Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-274Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-275Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-096CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Human Rights Watch.. (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 4/9/2018) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-137CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Human Rights Watch re 6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 4/13/2018) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-278CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security.. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-279STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Human Rights Watch. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 4/27/2018) Modified on 4/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2710CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Human Rights Watch re 1 Complaint, 4 Summons Issued as to USA, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 2 Proposed Summons CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, and Case-Opening Documents (Richards, Matthew) (Filed on 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-2511STIPULATION Continuing Deadline to Respond to 1 Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Human Rights Watch. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 5/25/2018) Modified on 5/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-2512ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Department of Homeland Security. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 6/25/2018) Modified on 6/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-2713ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2714NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2815ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on July 19, 2018 at 10:30 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1116JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Homeland Security, Human Rights Watch, and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 7/11/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1217CLERK'S NOTICE: The court reviewed the parties' 7/11/2018 joint case management conference statement 16 . Having no objection from the Plaintiff, the Defendants' request to continue the Initial Case Management Conference is granted. The Initial Case Management Conference previously scheduled for 7/18/2018 01:30 PM has been continued to 8/29/2018 01:30 PM. Updated Joint Case Management Conference is due by 8/22/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1818ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 7/17/2018 by Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-1819ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference is rescheduled to 8/14/2018 at 2:00 PM Pacific. The call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-1520ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 8/14/2018 by Howard Herman. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-2221JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Human Rights Watch, Department of Homeland Security, and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2222UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Human Rights Watch, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, and Department of Homeland Security. (Fletes, Christina) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2923PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/29/2018 1:36:33 PM ]. File Size [ 5568 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:36 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2924Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/29/2018. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2018 01:30 PM. See minute Order for more particulars. FTR Time: 1:36-1:48. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-11-1425JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Pereda, David) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar