Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePoulsen v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv01862
Date Filed2018-03-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffKevin Poulsen
Case DescriptionJournalist Kevin Poulsen submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for five semi-annual reports prepared by the Inspector General of the Intelligence Community. Poulsen also requested a fee waiver. The agency did not acknowledge receipt of Poulsen's email requests and he sent the request through the U.S. Postal Service, which confirmed his request had been received at the agency. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Poulsen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-261COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against Office of the Director of National Intelligence ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12220670.). Filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 3/26/2018) Modified on 3/27/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-262Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-03-27Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] The civil cover sheet filed is outdated. Please find the updated civil cover sheet at www.cand.uscourts.gov and re-file it using the event civil cover sheet. Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Kevin Poulsen (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-273Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-274Civil Cover Sheet by Kevin Poulsen . (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-275Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/27/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-03-276Summons Issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
2018-04-097CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Poulsen.. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 4/9/2018) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-168CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Poulsen (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 4/16/2018) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-119STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1110CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Office of the Director of National Intelligence.. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1111ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 9 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-06-1512NOTICE by Office of the Director of National Intelligence of Settlement (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 6/15/2018) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-1513CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the case management conference is rescheduled to 7/16/2018 at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-2714ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2815ADR Clerk's Notice of Withdrawal of Notice re: Non-Compliance (re: doc 14 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2018) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-0916STATUS REPORT AND JOINT REQUEST FOR VACATUR OF THE CMC by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1017ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff