Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSEARLE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00692
Date Filed2018-03-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffROBERT C. SEARLE
Case DescriptionRobert Searle submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning a contract with the Tank Automotive Armament Command. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Searle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-281COMPLAINT against ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5392713) filed by ROBERT CHRISTOPHER SEARLE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cvr Sht, # 2 Summons Service Summons, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-03-28Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-292SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-293REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by ROBERT CHRISTOPHER SEARLE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by ROBERT CHRISTOPHER SEARLE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons AG)(Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-304SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
2018-04-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/13/2018. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2018. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-117MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file an answer to the complaint by June 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/14/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-128Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by ROBERT C. SEARLE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER. The parties are ordered to meet and confer to determine whether an explanation by plaintiff can result in a more targeted search and streamlined process. The parties must file a joint status report by June 21, 2018. In the meantime, the Court will hold plaintiff's 8 motion for leave to amend his complaint in abeyance. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-229Joint STATUS REPORT by ROBERT C. SEARLE. (Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-25MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint by July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/25/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-0910AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY filed by ROBERT C. SEARLE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Brown, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-3111Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file an answer to the complaint by August 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/05/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/05/2018)
2018-08-0612ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY.(Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/06/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER. The Court amends its prior Minute Order issued on 8/6/2018 to reflect that defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before September 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/06/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-0413STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file an updated status report by September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/05/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar