Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00722
Date Filed2018-03-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of State for records concerning the company Uranium One. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-03-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5395348) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Department of State, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-29Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-03-293SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
2018-04-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/9/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/09/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/9/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/11/2018; (See docket entry no. 4 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-05-016NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-097ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Whitaker, Claire) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 6/8/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/9/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-088NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-089Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report (and proposed order ) by July 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/11/18. (DJS) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-1610Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by September 4, 2018 and every 30 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed production schedule and/or briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-09-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-10-0312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar