Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00741
Date Filed2018-04-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning detention notices sent by ICE to law enforcement agencies which did not respond. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-021COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5400579) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons Defendant, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 4/3/2018 (zsth). (Entered: 04/02/2018)
2018-04-02Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-133RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/13/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/12/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-176GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 17, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/13/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-249ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 4/25/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-25NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error and is duplicate of docket entry no. 5 (td) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-0310NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-0411NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Rose Rehberg on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-1412Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1613ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, because the government's motion for an extension is premised on an erroneous conclusion, and because the government's requested deadline to respond is only one day after its answer or dispositive motion is actually due, it is hereby ORDERED that the government's 12 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 16, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-06-0814NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-1215ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-13MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 13, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings due by 7/6/2018. (hs) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-0216PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 1, 2018; (2) the plaintiff shall file an opposition to the defendant's motion and a cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 1, 2018; (3) the defendant shall file a reply in support of its motion and an opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before October 21, 2018; and (4) the plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion on or before November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 2, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 9/1/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 10/1/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/21/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/12/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-09-0417Joint MOTION to Stay by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0418ERRATA by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT 17 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Motion)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' [18-1] Joint Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that the parties' motion to stay the case is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the current summary judgment briefing schedule is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 4, 2018, apprising the Court of whether the case can be resolved without further litigation. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 5, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2018 (hs) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-1119NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L. Casale on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-2220Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 20 Consent Motion to Extend, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status report on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 27, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2018 (hs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-1221STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 21 Plaintiff's Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 24, 2018, the defendant shall file its status report in compliance with the Court's September 27, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 17, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1722STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/24/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 22 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status report on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 17, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-3023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Sarah Rose Rehberg terminated. (Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar