Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00754
Date Filed2018-04-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce and the Department of the Treasury for records concerning President Trump's visit to Saudi Arabia. DFF also requested a fee waiver. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Commerce granted DFF's request for a fee waiver. Treasury asked DFF to narrow the scope of its request and DFF clarified the request. But after hearing nothing further from either agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-031COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5403067) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-032Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
2018-04-03Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-134NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Lewis on behalf of DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Lewis, John) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/9/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 4/9/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 4/9/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/9/2018. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-266NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-087Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-09MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must file an answer to the complaint by June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/09/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-118ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, on or before July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/11/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-07-099STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit another joint status report by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/10/18. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-09-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-13MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by October 10, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/13/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-10-1011Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Joint Status Report 11 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by November 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/11/18. (DMK) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall submit another joint status report by 11/12/2018. (jth) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-11-1212Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar