Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVOTEVETS ACTION FUND v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00762
Date Filed2018-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffVOTEVETS ACTION FUND
Case DescriptionThe VoteVets Action Fund submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning the organization as well as records concerning the firing of Secretary of Veterans Affairs David Shulkin. VoteVets Action Fund also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told VoteVets Action Fund that it would be unable to respond within 30 days. VoteVets Action Fund then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5404203) filed by VOTEVETS ACTION FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-04Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-063LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VOTEVETS ACTION FUND (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/11/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/11/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 4/16/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-255GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 25, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-146ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before June 4, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 14, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 6/4/2018. (hs) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-227NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Frances Thurston on behalf of VOTEVETS ACTION FUND (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-048Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before July 12, 2018, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 8, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-07-129Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report on or before August 28, 2018, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 12, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-2810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the government process at least 750 pages per month and release the responsive, non-exempt portions in a rolling production approximately every thirty days. It is further ORDERED that the parties file an additional joint status report on or before October 24, 2018, regarding how to proceed in this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 29, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/24/2018 (tj) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-10-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report on or before December 13, 2018, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 24, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar