Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCASTANEDA SANCHEZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00765
Date Filed2018-04-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffRANFIEL CASTANEDA SANCHEZ
Case DescriptionRanfiel Castaneda Sanchez submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records about himself. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement acknowledged receipt of his request. The State Department located 85 documents, but only disclosed 12 documents in full and six documents in part. Sanchez then refiled his request to the State Department for the records that had been withheld in response to his first request. the agency acknowledged receipt of that request, but after hearing nothing further from either agency, Sanchez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Discovery, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5404733) filed by RANFIEL CASTANEDA SANCHEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons DHS, # 5 Summons DHS)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-042NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by RANFIEL CASTANEDA SANCHEZ. Case related to Case No. 17-1459. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- W. Asa Hutchinson III, :Firm- The Asa Hutchinson Law Group, PLC, :Address- 912 W. Central Ave., Bentonville, Arkansas 72712. Phone No. - (479) 878-1600. Fax No. - (479) 876-8283 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5404771. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by RANFIEL CASTANEDA SANCHEZ (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-054SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-09MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-05-105NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2018. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-297Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' response to the complaint shall be due by July 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/1/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-07-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/27/2018. (lccrc3) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/10/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-109Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1410MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 11, 2018 to inform the Court of the status of DHS's production and to provide a proposed briefing schedule regarding the FOIA request to the State Department, if appropriate. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/14/2018. (lccrc3) Modified on 8/14/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar