Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00783
Date Filed2018-04-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA. The first request concerned communications between administrator Scott Pruitt and a variety of individuals and organizations pertaining to a number of keywords. The second FOIA request concerned communications between two EPA Region 6 employees pertaining to a variety of individuals and topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. The agency told CfA that it would provide records responsive to the Region 6 request on a rolling basis. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either request, CfA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-051COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5407146) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons for USAO, # 6 Summons for AG, # 7 Summons for EPA)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (jd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-094STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/9/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/13/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 4/12/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-096NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-147Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint, 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/15/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 6/1/2018. (kt) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-298Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/8/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-089NOTICE of Case Developments by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-0810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before June 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/12/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 6/19/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1911ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 12, 2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss the status of the Department's search and scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/20/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/12/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 7/12/2018. Defendant shall complete their search by 7/31/2018; The parties shall meet and confer, then file a Joint Status Report by 8/10/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-0112NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Alexander Shoaibi (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-1013Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before November 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/11/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/11/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar