Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00787
Date Filed2018-04-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense, the Department of Transportation, the Federal Aviation Administration, and the General Services Administration for records concerning the travel practices of senior federal officials, including the use of non-commercial air travel. All the agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. DOD told American Oversight that it was referring the request to the Air Force as well. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
TERMINATED: 10/15/2019
DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
DefendantFEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
TERMINATED: 08/28/2019
DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
TERMINATED: 08/28/2019
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5408715) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/06/2018)
2018-04-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/9/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-093ERRATA by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT 2 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate Rule LCvR7.1)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-09Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-095STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/9/2018. (lctnm3) (ztd). (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-094SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION served on 4/23/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 4/23/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE served on 4/23/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 4/20/2018; U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 4/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-177NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-178Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall now respond before or on June 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/21/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 6/13/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-06-129ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/12/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall continue to confer about the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests and, by the first of each month, submit a joint status report on the progress of Defendants' response and the parties' discussions. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall, fourteen days after the Defendants' final production of documents, submit a joint status report for further proceedings, including, as necessary, a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-08-0111Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will continue to confer about the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests, and will submit monthly status reports to the Court on the 1st of each month. The parties shall submit a status report within 14 days of Defendants' final release of responsive records, indicating what issues, if any, remain in the litigation. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/2/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-3012Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-10-0113Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-11-0114Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-3015Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-3116MOTION to Stay in Light of a Lapse of Appropriations by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-02MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 16 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/2/2019.(lctnm2) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-2817NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' 17 Notice, the Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are ORDERED to resume filing monthly Joint Status Reports until the Defendants' final release of responsive records. The next report shall be filed on or before March 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/29/19. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019, and every month thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-03-0118Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-04-0119Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-05-0120Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-3021Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-07-0122Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-3023Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on August 28, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/30/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-08-2724Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-2725STIPULATION of Dismissal as to GSA and FAA by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/27/2019)
2019-08-28Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 8/28/2019. Government's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/15/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition to Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 11/22/2019. Government's Reply in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 12/20/2019. Plaintiff's Reply in support of its Cross-Motion due by 1/10/2020. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (hmc) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, the Plaintiff's claims against the Federal Aviation Administration and General Services Administration are hereby DISMISSED per the terms of the stipulation. This order shall have no effect on the remaining claims. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/28/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-1326NOTICE of Appearance by Christine H. Monahan on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
2019-10-1127Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before October 22, 2019; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due December 4, 2019; Defendants' Opposition and Reply shall be due December 27, 2019; and Plaintiff's Reply shall be due January 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/11/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/22/2019. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/4/2019. Defendants' Opposition and Reply due by 12/27/2019. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/17/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-1528STIPULATION of Dismissal as to DOT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, the Plaintiff's claims against the U.S. Department of Transportation are hereby DISMISSED per the terms of the stipulation. This order shall have no effect on the remaining claims. Each party shall bear its own costs, attorney fees, and expenses. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/15/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-2229NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Elizabeth France terminated. (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-10-2230MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/22/2019)
2019-12-0431Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Christine H. Monahan, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Statement of Facts)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-0432Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Christine H. Monahan, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Statement of Facts)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-1033Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-13MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants shall file their Opposition and Reply on or before January 10, 2020, and the Plaintiff shall file its Reply on or before January 31, 2020. Further requests for extension shall be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/13/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/13/2019)
2019-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition and Reply due by 1/10/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 1/31/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 12/13/2019)
2020-01-1034REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-1035Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-3136REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-03-2037NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-04-2438ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit any supplemental declarations in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than May 18, 2020; further ORDERED that Defendants shall submit any supplemental brief in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment concurrently with any supplemental declarations no later than May 18, 2020; and further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit any sur-reply to the Defendants' supplemental filings by no later than June 1, 2020. See attached Order for further details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/24/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' supplemental declarations due by 5/18/2020. Defendants' supplemental brief due by 5/18/2020. Plaintiff's sur-reply due by 6/1/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-05-1839SUPPLEMENT re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE re 38 Order,, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 2d Herrington Decl.)(Field, Brian) Modified docket event/text on 5/19/2020 (eg). (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-0140SURREPLY to re 39 Notice (Other), filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-07-16MINUTE ORDER: Defendants are directed to electronically submit to the Court for in camera review, by July 23, 2020, unredacted copies of every document redacted pursuant to the presidential communications privilege, indicating which portions of the documents had been redacted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/16/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' unredacted copies due by 7/23/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-2341SEALED DOCUMENT filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE re Order, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-2342NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera Filing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendants' 30 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear by telephone for a Motion Hearing on August 12, 2020 at 2 p.m. Dial-in information will be emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/29/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-30Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-3143Consent MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-31MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 43 Consent Motion to Continue Motion Hearing. The parties shall appear by telephone for a Motion Hearing on August 26, 2020, at 2 p.m., before Judge McFadden. Dial-in information has been emailed to counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 7/31/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-31Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Motion Hearing rescheduled to 8/26/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-08-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2020. 31 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT, DENIED. 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DENIED. Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020, including the status of the documents produced by the government and the attempts the parties have made to resolve the case. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (hmc) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-09-2144TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Trevor N. McFadden, held on 08/26/2020. Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance: 09/21/2020. Court Reporter: Sara A. Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/12/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2020.(Wick, Sara) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar