Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00798
Date Filed2018-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Case DescriptionThe American Center for Law and Justice submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the Carter Center's alleged support of Hamas and the PLO. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, ACLJ filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5412035) filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Southerland, Abigail) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/10/2018) (zmd). Modified on 4/10/2018 (zmd). (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-04-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-113NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Sisney, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-114Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2018. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/13/2018 (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/13/2018. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-148ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-149NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by May 30, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 15, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/30/2018 (tj) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-3010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Rule 16.3 Statement by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 16.3 Statement: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint report in accordance with Local Civil Rule 16.3 by July 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 6, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 7/16/2018. (tj) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-1611MOTION for Extension of Time to file the parties' Rule 16.3 Statement by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: The parties' Joint Report under Local Rule 16.3 shall be submitted by July 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 19, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-1913SCHEDULING ORDER: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 19, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/31/2018 (tj) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-3014NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia F. Summers on behalf of AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE (Summers, Olivia) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-3015Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE. (Southerland, Abigail) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by October 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 31. 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/25/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar