Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00814
Date Filed2018-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Cadiz Valley Water Project, communications of Deputy Secretary David Bernhardt, and communications of Deputy Secretary Todd Willens along with his appointment calendar. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-101COMPLAINT FOIA against All Plaintiffs against U.S. Department of the Interior et al. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5413642) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Certificate, # 3 Summons Interior, # 4 Summons BLM, # 5 Summons US Atty, # 6 Summons AG, # 7 Motion, # 8 Declaration Pro Hac Vice)(Snape, William) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/11/2018) (jd) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-10Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-12SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-163REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Snape, William) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-164MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lisa T. Belenky, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- 1212 Broadway St. #800 Oakland, CA 94612. Phone No. - 510-844-7107. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5424319. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-175SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Lisa T. Belenky is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/18/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-256GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/25/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-017ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons Successful Return Receipt, # 2 Summons Successful Return Receipt, # 3 Summons Successful Return Receipt)(Snape, William) Modified on 5/2/2018 (jf). (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-02NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the proper events ( Summons returned executed as to Federal Defendants (you must select each defendant and not the radio button), Summons returned executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney and Summons returned executed as to U.S. Attorney General) (jf) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-158RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 5/8/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/7/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/7/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018.) (Snape, William) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff