Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00815
Date Filed2018-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionProfessional Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the U.S. Geological Survey study of energy assessment for the National Petroleum Reserve Alaska. The agency acknowledged of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-101COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5413822) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Interior, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons USAO)(Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-124STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 12, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-05-185NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-186Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by July 2, 2018, file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 18, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/2/2018. (tg) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-07-027ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (1) why the parties failed to file a joint meet and confer statement per this Court's 4 Standing Order, § 3(b)(ii); and (2) why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff shall respond by August 3, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 30, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause due by 8/3/2018. (tg) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-028Joint STATUS REPORT. (Carlesco, Adam) Modified event title on 8/3/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by October 1, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-239NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Naomi Dinerstein on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 8/23/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-2310NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. Attorney Adam Scott Carlesco terminated. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-10-0111Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, that the parties file a further joint status report by October 31, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 2, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-11-0112Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, that the parties file a further joint status report by November 30, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 1, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar