Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00817
Date Filed2018-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning communications between the agency and Ivanka Trump or Jared Kushner and other White House staffers working with them pertaining to the Trump administration's decision to stay collection of EEO-1 pay data. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-101COMPLAINT against U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5414181) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/18/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 4/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-174NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-175ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by June 1, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 17, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/1/2018 (tj) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-316Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by June 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 31, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/15/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-147Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 , the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, by July 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 14, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/31/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-318Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report, with a proposed briefing schedule if necessary, by August 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 31, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-149Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by September 12, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request and identifying what, if any, issues remain. If the parties conclude that summary judgment briefing is necessary, they shall include a proposed briefing schedule in this status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 14, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/12/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-09-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by November 2, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request and identifying what, if any, issues remain. If the parties conclude that summary judgment briefing is necessary, they shall include a proposed briefing schedule in this status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 12, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar