Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00824
Date Filed2018-04-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Campaign Legal Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning GEO Correction Holding's relationship with a specific ICE detention facility. CLC also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-101COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5415688) filed by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons as to Attorney General of the United States, # 5 Summons as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 6 Summons as to U.S. Attorney)(Gaber, Mark) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/11/2018) (jd) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
2018-04-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 4/16/2018 (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/17/2018. (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/17/2018. (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-217NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/21/2018)
2018-05-158MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-159RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until and including June 18, 2018 to respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on May 15, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/18/2018. (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-1810ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before July 3, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 19, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/3/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 3, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 2, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/3/2018 (tj) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-08-0312Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before September 7, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 3, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-0713Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 8, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 7, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/8/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-0814STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-0915Joint STATUS REPORT (Revised) by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gaber, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 9, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-11-0216Joint STATUS REPORT by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report, including a proposed briefing schedule, on or before January 8, 2019, if the matter has not been dismissed by that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on November 5, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar