Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00831
Date Filed2018-04-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the Cliven Bundy prosecution, the Andrew McCabe investigation, and the recommendation for the appointment of a special counsel to investigate Fusion GSP. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Freedom Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5417339) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/12/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-04-11Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsth) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff filed this action on 04/11/2018 and the Clerk of the Court issued summonses on 04/12/2018. It appears from the record that Plaintiff, has yet to effectuate service on the Defendants. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before 7/25/18, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Should Plaintiff fail to effectuate service or satisfactorily respond to the present order by 7/25/18, the court may dismiss this action without further notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 7/25/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-233RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Response to the Court's Minute Order of July 18, 2018 by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. re Order to Show Cause,, (Klayman, Larry) Modified event title on 8/7/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-22MINUTE ORDER: By 8/31/18 Plaintiff shall file a notice updating the court on Plaintiff's efforts to effectuate service. Failure to file a timely response may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/22/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice to Court regarding the effectuation of service due by 8/31/2018. (tb) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-314RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-195NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-266MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-267RESPONSE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar