Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00844
Date Filed2018-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the attendance of then Russian Ambassador to the U.S. Sergey Kislyak at the Republican National Convention. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5419091) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-12Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-235ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-24MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by June 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/24/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-076Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties 6 status report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report on or before July 27, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/7/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-267Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule for Disclosure by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties 7 status report and ORDERS that they shall file a further status report on or before November 16, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/27/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/16/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar