Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00849
Date Filed2018-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR")
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning the agency's decision to stop its policy of sending decentralized correspondence and educational correspondence notices to employers from 2011 through August 2012. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DefendantSOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
6401 SECURITY BLVD, MD 21235
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5419446) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Defendant, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-133LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/16/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/23/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 4/16/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-227NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Hohenstein on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Hohenstein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-228NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-229Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 9 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before June 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 22, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 6/22/2018, (hs) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-0810NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2011Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 21, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 7/23/2018, (hs) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-2312NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Alexander D. Shoaibi (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2313Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 13 Consent Motion of Time to Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 25, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 8/22/2018(hs) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-2214Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Hohenstein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before September 22, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the plaintiff's review of the defendant's document productions to date. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its answer to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 23, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint tatus Report due by 9/22/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-1115NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L. Casale on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar