Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv03215
Date Filed2018-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jesse M. Furman
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning reports transmitted to the Senate Labor and Human Resources Committee and the House Energy and Commerce Committee as required under 42 U.S.C. Section 300aa-27(c). The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Informed Consent Action Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-121COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14934331)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-13***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Aaron Siri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Informed Consent Action Network. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-134ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-135ORDER: This case arises under the Freedom of Information Act, Title 5, United States Code, Section 552. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint letter, no later than two weeks from the date of this order and not to exceed two pages, indicating whether there is any need for discovery or an initial conference in this case. If there is no such need, the parties should include in their letter a proposed briefing schedule for any motions, including motions for summary judgment. If Defendant has not yet entered a notice of appearance, Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant and file proof of such service. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/13/2018) (ras) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-186AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/16/2018, answer due 5/16/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-187AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of April 13, 2018 Order of Hon. Jesse M. Furman (ECF Doc. No. 5) served on United States Department of Health and Human Services on 4/16/18. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-268CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 4/19/2018, answer due 5/21/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-279JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Until May 11, 2018 to Submit Joint Letter Required by the Court's Order of April 13, 2018 addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Aaron Siri dated 4/27/2018. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2710NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-2911ORDER granting 9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit a joint letter pursuant to the Court's April 13, 2018 Order is hereby EXTENDED to May 11, 2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 04/29/2018)
2018-05-0212CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 5/2/2018, answer due 6/1/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0913JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Aaron Siri dated May 9, 2018. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-0914ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion for Conference. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an initial conference on June 13, 2018, at 3:30 p.m. No later than the Thursday prior to the initial conference, each party shall file via ECF a letter, not to exceed five pages single spaced, outlining its position on the need for discovery and, if appropriate, proposing a production and/or briefing schedule. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff