Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRobinson v. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityColumbia
Case Number3:2018cv00998
Date Filed2018-04-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Margaret B Seymour
PlaintiffRonald Robinson
Case DescriptionRonald Robinson submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning a variety of topics. He appealed the agency's apparent denial of some requests, but eventually filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-121COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300075943), filed by Ronald Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents)(mwal) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-123Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ronald Robinson.(mwal) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
2018-04-198ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 4/19/2018. (mwal) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-199Summons Issued as to Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 7/18/2018. (mwal) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-1910***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Order Service - Non-Inmate, 9 Summons Issued as to USA, Complaint placed in U.S. Mail to Ronald Robinson. (mwal) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-06-2211MOTION for Extension of Time by Department of Veterans Affairs. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2212TEXT ORDER granting 11 MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise plead is now July 25, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V Hodges on 6/22/2018. (mwal) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2213***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Text Order placed in U.S. Mail to Ronald Robinson. (mwal) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-07-2514ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Department of Veterans Affairs.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-2615SCHEDULING ORDER (Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/23/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/26/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/27/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/27/2018, Discovery due by 2/20/2019, Motions due by 3/7/2019, ADR Statement due by 4/5/2019, Mediation Due by 5/6/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/26/2018. (bgoo) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-2616***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail to Ronald Robinson. (bgoo) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-09-0517MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ronald Robinson. Response to Motion due by 9/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-1918RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response filed by Department of Veterans Affairs.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/26/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar