Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00868
Date Filed2018-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffNATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe National Iranian-American Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning OMB Emergency Approval of visas and other aspects of policy affected by the Trump administration. The Council also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Council filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5421150) filed by NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Department of State, # 3 Summons to United States Attorney General, # 4 Summons to United States Attorney for DC, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(Modarres, Shayan) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) Modified number of summonses issued on 5/1/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-173STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/19/2018 (Modarres, Shayan) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General April 19, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Modarres, Shayan) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Confirmation)(Modarres, Shayan) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-227NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-238ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-24MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on June 29, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 21, to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/24/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-24Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/29/2018, at 11:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-189NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2110NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL. Attorney Shayan H. Modarres terminated. (Modarres, Shayan) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 6/29/2018. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 8/10/2018 to update the court as to the searches and production of documents, as well as propose a schedule for moving forward. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0911NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-08-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Status Report 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before September 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/13/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2018. (kt) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-2013NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnathan James Smith (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2014NOTICE of Change of Address by Sirine Shebaya (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2215MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew W. Callahan, :Firm- Muslim Advocates, :Address- PO Box 34440, Washington, DC 20043. Phone No. - 202-897-2622. Fax No. - 202-508-1007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5651616. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew W. Callahan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Matthew W. Callahan may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/22/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report 16 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2617Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL. (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/29/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (kt) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-3018Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/02/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-2819MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion for stay of filing joint status report 19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant's counsel shall notify the Court as soon as Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/28/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-2820NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: In light of the government's notice 20 , it is hereby ORDERED that the case is UNSTAYED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2019. (kt) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-0121NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL. Attorney Johnathan James Smith terminated. (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0622Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/7/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2019. (dot) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-0723Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/8/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019. (kt) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-2624Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 24 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/30/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019. (kt) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-06-2625Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 25 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/26/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019. (kt) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-08-1626NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL IRANIAN AMERICAN COUNCIL. Attorney Sirine Shebaya terminated. (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-2627Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-10-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report 27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before November 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/3/19. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (dot) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-11-0128Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar