Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00874
Date Filed2018-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the number and country of citizenship for H-2A and H-2B visa holders who overstayed their period of admission for FY13-FY17. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-131COMPLAINT against US Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5422565) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR"). (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Defendant, # 4 Summons US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/1/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM ("FAIR") (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-13Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (jd) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-05-014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/30/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 4/30/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-047NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Rose Rehberg on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-308Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion to Enlarge Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, the defendant shall file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 30, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/2/2018. (JK) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-089NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Julie B. Axelrod terminated. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-07-0210ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report on or before August 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 6, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-08-0611Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File the parties' Joint Status Report by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 11 Motion to Enlarge Time to File the Parties' Joint Status Report, which is unopposed. Accordingly, the joint status report shall be filed on or before September 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 9, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/6/2018 (JK) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-0612Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or another joint status report on or before October 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 7, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1113NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph L. Casale on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-0914Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 10, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-3015NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. Attorney Sarah Rose Rehberg terminated. (Rehberg, Sarah) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-0916Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 13, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 3, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-1118MOTION to Stay by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER granting in part the defendant's 18 Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. It is ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint status report within seven days of Congress restoring appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 11, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-02-0119Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/03/2019)
2019-02-2820NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION Substituting for attorney Doris Denise Coles-Huff (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-0121Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 4, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-04-0522Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 5, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/07/2019)
2019-05-0723Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 9, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-05-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/09/2019)
2019-06-0724Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 10, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-07-0925Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 10, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2019. (kh) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-08-0826Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 9, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 8, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar