Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWilderness Workshop v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv00887
Date Filed2018-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge R. Brooke Jackson
PlaintiffWilderness Workshop a Colorado non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Wilderness Workshop submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Forest Service for records concerning a proposed road through a wilderness habitat that would negatively affect one of Colorado's migrating deer herds. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided three interim responses, none of which fully responded to the Wilderness Workshop's request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Wilderness Workshop filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture a federal agency
DefendantUnited States Forest Service a federal agency within the
other Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6052613)Attorney Travis Earl Stills added to party Wilderness Workshop(pty:pla), filed by Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-162Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-163Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-184MINUTE ORDER: On review of the complaint, the Court directs plaintiff counsel to confer with defense counsel after service has been accomplished and defense counsel has either entered an appearance or contacted plaintiff counsel. Counsel are directed to confer in person or by telephone, in good faith, and to use their best efforts to resolve the dispute, including the production of additional records if appropriate. If a resolution is not reached, then the parties are directed to set a telephone status conference with the Court within 7 days after they determine that a resolution can't be reached by agreement. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/18/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-185SUMMONS REQUEST as to Department of Agriculture, Forest Service by Plaintiff Wilderness Workshop. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-206SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (dkals, ) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-287SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Federal FOIA Defendants Response Due 5/21/2018 defendant(s) United States Department of Agriculture served on 4/20/2018, answer due 6/19/2018; United States Forest Service served on 4/20/2018, answer due 6/19/2018. (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 04/28/2018)
2018-05-118NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paige Campbell Anderson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Paige Campbell Anderson added to party United States Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Paige Campbell Anderson added to party United States Forest Service(pty:dft) (Anderson, Paige) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-249Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 1 Complaint, by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Anderson, Paige) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2510ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/25/18. Text Only Entry (jdyne, ) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-0111ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service.(Anderson, Paige) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-1312STATUS REPORT and Request to Set Phone Conference by Plaintiff Wilderness Workshop. (Stills, Travis) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-1813MINUTE ORDER re: 12 Status Report filed by Wilderness Workshop. The Court directs counsel to jointly contact Chambers at Jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov or (303) 844-4694 to schedule a Telephone Conference. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/18/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-1914MINUTE ORDER: A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/28/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. The Court requests that plaintiff's counsel provide by email conference dial-in information to both the Court and opposing counsel. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-2815COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2018. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, ) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-09-0416NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrea Wang on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrea Wang added to party United States Department of Agriculture(pty:dft), Attorney Andrea Wang added to party United States Forest Service(pty:dft) (Wang, Andrea) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1117MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants United States Department of Agriculture, United States Forest Service. (Anderson, Paige) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1218ORDER granting 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Paige Campbell Anderson is withdrawn. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/12/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar