Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC. et al v. PERDUE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00887
Date Filed2018-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.
PlaintiffDELCIANNA J. WINDERS
PlaintiffPHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE
PlaintiffMASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS
PlaintiffRESCUE AND FREEDOM PROJECT
Case DescriptionPeople for the Ethical Treatment of Animals and several other animal rights organizations requested that the Animal and Plant Health Inspection Service post enforcement reports under the Animal Welfare Act in its electronic public reading room under the affirmative disclosure provision of FOIA. PETA and the other plaintiffs argued that requiring individual FOIA requests for enforcement reports was inefficient and increased the agency's workload.
Complaint issues: Affirmative disclosure

DefendantSONNY PERDUE Secretary, United States Department of Agriculture
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-161COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5423971) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons APHIS, # 4 Summons Secretary Perdue, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 6 Summons USDA)(Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-162Corporate Disclosure Statement by PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC.. (Meyer, Katherine) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-163Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Meyer, Katherine) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-164Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE. (Meyer, Katherine) (Main Document 4 replaced on 4/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-165Corporate Disclosure Statement by Massachusetts Society for the Prevention of Cruelty to Animals. (Meyer, Katherine) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-166Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rescue and Freedom Project. (Meyer, Katherine) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/18/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-187NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, RESCUE AND FREEDOM PROJECT, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-269. (zmd) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-18Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-188SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-149NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of All Defendants (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-1410Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-15MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the complaint shall be due by June 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/15/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/22/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-2211MOTION to Dismiss by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2512NOTICE of Appearance by William Lawton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lawton, William) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-0313ERRATA by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, SONNY PERDUE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANIMAL AND PLANT HEALTH INSPECTION SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, SONNY PERDUE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-0314Consent MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, RESCUE AND FREEDOM PROJECT, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS (Meyer, Katherine) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-11MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Hold in Abeyance. The parties shall file joint status reports updating the Court on the status of Plaintiffs' administrative requests every 60 days beginning September 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/11/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-09-1115Joint STATUS REPORT by MASSACHUSETTS SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS, PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS, INC., PHYSICIANS COMMITTEE FOR RESPONSIBLE MEDICINE, RESCUE AND FREEDOM PROJECT, DELCIANNA J. WINDERS. (Lawton, William) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar