Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00890
Date Filed2018-04-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning a natural gas project in Sublette County, Wyoming. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency placed unreadable GPS data on its website and told WildEarth Guardians that the request was still being processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-161COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5425920) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-162Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-05-074NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/24/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 4/23/2018 (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-248ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-25MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 8, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/25/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-089Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 June 8, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before September 6, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/11/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-09-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the court on the production of responsive records on or before December 5, 2018, and every 90 days thereafter, until the completion of the production of records. Upon completion of the final production, the parties shall advise the court whether summary judgment briefing will be necessary and, if so, propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-1811NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly E. Nokes (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar