Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFarmworker Justice et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv02293
Date Filed2018-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffFarmworker Justice
PlaintiffEarthjustice
Case DescriptionEarthjustice submitted a FOIA request to the EPA on behalf of Farmworker Justice for records concerning a November 2017 meeting of EPA's Pesticide Program Dialogue Committee and any communications and meetings with state departments of agriculture and members of the agriculture and pesticide industries. Eathjustice requested a fee waiver. The agency told Earthjustice that its request would not incur fees. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Farmworker Justice and Earthjustice filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-171COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief (Freedom of Information Act Case) against U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12277856). Filed by Earthjustice & Farmworker Justice. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/17/2018) Modified on 4/18/2018 (tnS). (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-172Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-173Proposed Summons. (Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/17/2018) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-174Certification of Interested Entities or Persons and Disclosure Statement filed by Earthjustice & Farmworker Justice (Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/17/2018) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-185Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS) (Filed on 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-186Summons Issued as to Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (tnS) (Filed on 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-197MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12285209) filed by Earthjustice, Farmworker Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Oath, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Apfel, Carrie) (Filed on 4/19/2018) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-198MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12285376) filed by Earthjustice, Farmworker Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Oath, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lehner, Peter) (Filed on 4/19/2018) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-239MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Earthjustice, Farmworker Justice. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 5/7/2018. Replies due by 5/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiffs' FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - PPDC Transcript, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Bertrand Letter, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - PPDC NGO Letter to EPA, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - FOIA Confirmation Email, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Fee Waiver Determination, # 7 Declaration Ex. 7 - Smith Decl., # 8 Declaration Ex. 8 - Ruiz Decl., # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - FOIAOnline Screenshot, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Bertrand Letter to Eve Gartner, Earthjustice, # 11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/23/2018) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2310CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Earthjustice, Farmworker Justice.. (Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/23/2018) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2411Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Carrie Apfel representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2412Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter Lehner representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-2713CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Earthjustice, Farmworker Justice (Andiman, Alexis) (Filed on 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-0214CLERK'S NOTICE Changing Time of Motion Hearing: Notice is given that the Motion Hearing Re: 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 6/11/2018 will be held at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , Set/Reset Deadlines as to. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-0415STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0416ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 15 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 5/21/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0417CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/11/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-0818CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 5/8/2018) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-1619STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Further Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-1720ORDER AS MODIFIED by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 19 Stipulation to Further Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 6/4/2018. Replies due by 6/11/2018. Motion Hearing reset for 6/25/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff