Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00893
Date Filed2018-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning waivers or approvals of first-class air travel by administrator Scott Pruitt and two other EPA officials. American Oversight submitted a fourth FOIA request for records concerning the procurement of a vehicle to transport Pruitt. The agency acknowledged receipt of all four requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-171COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5426143) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to EPA)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (jd) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-05-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/24/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 4/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-215Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading now is due on or before June 21, 2018. Per the agreement of the parties, if Defendant's responsive pleading is an Answer, then Defendant shall file a status report on or before June 28, 2018, that updates the court on the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/21/2018. (lcapm2) (lcapm2, ) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responsive Pleading due by 6/21/2018, Status Report due by 6/28/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-216ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-277ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 11, 2018. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/27/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-278ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for July 27, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/27/2018. (lcapm2) Modified on 6/27/2018 (jf). (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018. (zjd) Modified to remove erroneously filed hearing date on 6/29/2018 (zjd). (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 8 Order, was entered in error and will be refiled in correct case. (jf) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-289STATUS REPORT (Defendant's Status Report Pursuant to May 21, 2018 Order) by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings were entered in error. (zjd) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report on or before August 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/12/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/20/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2712MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 897-3918. Fax No. - (202) 871-6523 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5659778. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Katherine Marie Anthony is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/18/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report no later than October 30, 2018, which updates the court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/27/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report no later than November 28, 2018, which updates the court on the status of production and, if necessary, proposes a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar