Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00898
Date Filed2018-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning appointment calendars maintained for former Deputy Director Andrew McCabe. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5427730) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-172LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmd) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-183STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/18/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/30/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Lee, Eric) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-306NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto on behalf of All Defendants (Takemoto, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-307ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before June 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/30/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by 6/20/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-188Amended ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Redline Amended Answer)(Takemoto, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-209Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall, before or on August 31, 2018, file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed schedule for any future proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/20/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 8/31/2018 (hmc) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-08-3110Joint STATUS REPORT (SECOND) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall provide a further update on or before September 14, 2018. This update shall report on the status of the parties' attempts to resolve any outstanding issues, and propose a briefing schedule as necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/4/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: A further Joint Status Report is due by 9/14/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1411Joint STATUS REPORT (THIRD) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Lee, Eric) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status update on or before October 5, 2018. This update shall include a proposed briefing schedule for future proceedings if necessary. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/17/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-0112NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Thomas Takemoto (Takemoto, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar