Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFarmers Deli Grocery v. United States of America et al
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2018cv02275
Date Filed2018-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Allyne R. Ross
PlaintiffFarmers Deli Grocery
Case DescriptionFarmers Deli Grocery submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning SNAP EBT transactions at Farmer Deli Grocery. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency responded to the request by redacting some records under Exemption 5 (privileges). Farmers Deli Grocery filed an administrative appeal. The agency responded to the appeal by telling Farmers Deli Grocery that it was withholding identifying information under Exemption 3 (other statutes), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Farmers Deli Grocery then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States of America, Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantSonny Perdue in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-171COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10363477 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Farmers Deli Grocery. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rita, William) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-172Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint, by Farmers Deli Grocery (Rita, William) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-17Case assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-18NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-25SECOND NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2) section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-263Civil Cover Sheet.. by Farmers Deli Grocery (Rita, William) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-264Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-265In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-266This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff