Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Century Foundation v. United States Department of Education
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv03352
Date Filed2018-04-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger
PlaintiffThe Century Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Century Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning a December 2017 announcement by the agency of a new policy for compensating students for misrepresentations by institutions of higher education. The Century Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Foundation's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Century Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-171COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14953203)Document filed by The Century Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-172MOTION for Martha Fulford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14953337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Century Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-173CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-174RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Century Foundation.(Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-175REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Education, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Century Foundation. (Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 2 MOTION for Martha Fulford to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14953337. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (vf) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-18Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (vf) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-18Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-186ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Education. (vf) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-187ORDER. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by May 23, 2018, e-mail the Orders and Judgments Clerk (judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov) a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/consent-to-proceed-before-us-magistrate-judge, and attached to this order, and as further specified and set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/18/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-188INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/30/2018 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/18/2018) (rjm) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-199ORDER granting 2 Motion for Martha Fulford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (Torres, Analisa) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-2410AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Education served on 4/24/2018, answer due 5/24/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Century Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-05-1011NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury on behalf of United States Department of Education. (Chaudhury, Arastu) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-1712CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2018) (mro) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff