Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00923
Date Filed2018-04-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Integrity Project submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning EPA photographer Eric Vance, including photographs uploaded to the agency's intranet site. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. EIP contacted the agency several times to check the status of the request and learned only that the request had been assigned to a different processor. After hearing nothing more from the agency, EIP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
1200 Pennsylvania Avenue
Washington, DC 20004
DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-191COMPLAINT Environmental Integrity Project against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5431631) filed by Environmental Integrity Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons EPA, # 15 Summons US AG, # 16 Summons USAO)(Greene, Mary) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by Environmental Integrity Project. (Greene, Mary) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
2018-04-233ENTERED IN ERROR.....CIVIL COVER SHEET by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet resending Civil Cover Sheet)(Greene, Mary) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-234CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT filed by ENVIRONMENTAL INTEGRITY PROJECT. (Greene, Mary) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-24Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-245SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff